There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Highly Rural Veteran Transportation Program Extension Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Highly Rural Veteran Transportation Program Extension Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Highly Rural Veteran Transportation Program Extension Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the authorization of appropriations to the Department of Veterans Affairs for purposes of awarding grants to veterans service organizations for the transportation of highly rural veterans.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4648)
02/05/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment. Without written report.
03/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/07/2020-10:53amHouseHeld at the desk.
08/07/2020-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/30/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4648)
07/30/2020SenateThe committee amendment as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4647)
07/30/2020SenateS.Amdt.2502 Amendment SA 2502 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/2020SenateS.Amdt.2502 Amendment SA 2502 proposed by Senator Sullivan. (consideration: CR S4647-4648; text: CR S4647-4648) To require a report by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs on the transportation of individuals to and from facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
07/30/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4647-4648)
02/05/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
02/05/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment. Without written report.
01/29/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/22/2019SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
03/14/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/25/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 01/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/14/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Hearings by
01/29/2020 Markup by
02/05/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.850. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/14/2019)

Highly Rural Veteran Transportation Program Extension Act

This bill reauthorizes through FY2021 a grant program to provide innovative transportation options to veterans in highly rural areas.