There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Jackson Gulch Rehabilitation Project Modification Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Jackson Gulch Rehabilitation Project Modification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to modify the terms of the Jackson Gulch rehabilitation project in Colorado, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/21/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 116-160.
03/25/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
11/21/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 309.
Action By: Senate
11/21/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 116-160.
09/25/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/26/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
03/25/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/15/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/25/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
11/21/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-160
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power06/26/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.860. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/25/2019)

Jackson Gulch Rehabilitation Project Modification Act

This bill modifies cost-sharing requirements between the Department of the Interior and the Mancos Water Conservancy District for the Jackson Gulch Rehabilitation Project in Colorado.