There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the grade and pay of podiatrists of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/08/2019Became Public Law No: 116-12.
04/08/2019Signed by President.
04/01/2019Presented to President.
03/28/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H2900)
03/28/2019Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
03/25/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1942-1943; text: CR S1942-1943)
03/25/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
04/08/2019Became Public Law No: 116-12.
04/08/2019Signed by President.
04/01/2019SenatePresented to President.
03/28/2019-11:02amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/28/2019-11:02amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2900)
03/28/2019-11:02amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2900)
03/28/2019HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
03/28/2019-11:02amHouseMr. Takano asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
03/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/26/2019-1:26pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/26/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/25/2019SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1942-1943; text: CR S1942-1943)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/25/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/26/2019 Referred to
03/28/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.