There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving HOPE for Alzheimer's

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide outreach and reporting on comprehensive Alzheimer's disease care planning services furnished under the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
03/26/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/26/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 03/26/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 03/26/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/26/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 04/04/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/04/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 04/08/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/08/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/08/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/08/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 04/08/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/08/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/09/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/10/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 04/10/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/10/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 04/29/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/29/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/30/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/30/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 04/30/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/30/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/30/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 05/09/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/09/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/15/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 05/15/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/15/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/16/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/21/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/22/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 06/20/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 06/24/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 06/25/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 07/16/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 07/29/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 08/01/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/01/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/10/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/18/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/15/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/15/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 10/31/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 10/31/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/14/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 12/05/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance03/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.880. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/26/2019)

Improving HOPE for Alzheimer's

This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to conduct outreach to health care practitioners regarding comprehensive care planning services that are available under Medicare for individuals with Alzheimer's disease and related dementias. The CMS must report on its outreach efforts, as well as on the number of beneficiaries receiving such services and any barriers to access.