There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the President to develop a strategy to ensure the security of next generation mobile telecommunications systems and infrastructure in the United States and to assist allies and strategic partners in maximizing the security of next generation mobile telecommunications systems, infrastructure, and software, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2020Became Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF)
03/23/2020Signed by President.
03/16/2020Presented to President.
03/11/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
03/04/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-184.
03/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/23/2020Became Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF)
03/23/2020Signed by President.
03/16/2020SenatePresented to President.
03/11/2020-2:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/11/2020-2:09pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1614-1615)
03/11/2020-2:08pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1614-1615)
03/11/2020-2:08pmHouseMr. Pallone asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
03/09/2020-6:02pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/09/2020-2:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/05/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/04/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1501-1502)
03/04/2020SenateS.Amdt.1510 Amendment SA 1510 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/04/2020SenateS.Amdt.1510 Amendment SA 1510 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S1507; text: CR S1501-1502) In the nature of a substitute.
03/04/2020SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
03/04/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1506-1507)
12/19/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 395.
12/19/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-184.
07/24/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/27/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/27/2019 Referred to
07/24/2019 Markup by
12/19/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-184

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.893. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-129 (03/23/2020)

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020

This bill requires the President, in consultation with relevant federal agencies, to develop a strategy to secure and protect U.S. fifth and future generations (5G) systems and infrastructure.

Such strategy, to be known as the National Strategy to Secure 5G and Next Generation Wireless Communications, shall (1) ensure the security of 5G wireless communications systems and infrastructure within the United States; (2) assist mutual defense treaty allies, strategic partners, and other countries in maximizing the security of 5G systems and infrastructure; and (3) protect the competitiveness of U.S. companies, privacy of U.S. consumers, and integrity of standards-setting bodies.