There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Hospital Regulatory Relief Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for a permanent extension of the enforcement instruction on supervision requirements for outpatient therapeutic services in critical access and small rural hospitals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/27/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S2048)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/27/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/11/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/02/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/30/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance03/27/2019 Referred to

As of 08/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.895 - Rural Hospital Regulatory Relief Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.