There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Bozeman, Montana, as the "Travis W. Atkins Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/30/2020Became Public Law No: 116-262. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2020Signed by President.
12/21/2020Presented to President.
12/10/2020Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 900 by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7431)
11/16/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5745)
11/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6767)
11/21/2019Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6766-6767)
03/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/30/2020Became Public Law No: 116-262. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2020Signed by President.
12/21/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/11/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/10/2020SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 900 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7431)
11/17/2020SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
11/16/2020-5:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2020-5:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5745)
11/16/2020-5:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 900.
11/16/2020-5:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5745-5746)
11/16/2020-5:05pmHouseMrs. Luria moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/26/2019-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/21/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6767)
11/21/2019SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6766-6767)
03/27/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text: CR S2048-2049)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/27/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/27/2019 Referred to
11/21/2019 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs11/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.900. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-262 (12/30/2020)

This bill designates the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Bozeman, Montana, as the Travis W. Atkins Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic or the Travis W. Atkins VA Clinic.