There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve the management of driftnet fishing.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/22/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4398-4399; text: CR S4398-4399)
12/05/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. With written report No. 116-166.
03/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/23/2020-7:42pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/23/2020-7:34pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/23/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/22/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4398-4399; text: CR S4398-4399)
12/05/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 316.
12/05/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. With written report No. 116-166.
04/03/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/27/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 03/27/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/18/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/18/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 06/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/27/2019 Referred to
04/03/2019 Markup by
12/05/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-166

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.906. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (07/22/2020)

Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act

This bill addresses certain driftnet fishing. (Driftnet fishing is a method of fishing in which a gillnet composed of a panel or panels of webbing, or a series of such gillnets, is placed in the water and allowed to drift with the currents and winds for the purpose of entangling fish in the webbing.)

Currently, the use of large-scale drift gillnets with a total length of 2.5 kilometers or more is prohibited in the United States. The bill expands the definition of large-scale driftnet fishing to prohibit the use of gillnets with a mesh size of 14 inches or greater. This expanded prohibition does not apply within the U.S. exclusive economic zone for five years.

The Department of Commerce must conduct a transition program to facilitate the phase out of large-scale driftnet fishing and to promote the adoption of alternative fishing practices that minimize the incidental catch of living marine resources.

Commerce must award grants to program participants.

The North Pacific Fishery Management Council may recommend and Commerce may approve regulations that require charter operators to pay fees on vessels that harvest Pacific halibut in specific International Pacific Halibut Commission regulatory areas.