There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Regulations from the Executive in Need of Scrutiny Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, to provide that major rules of the executive branch shall have no force or effect unless a joint resolution of approval is enacted into law.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/10/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/22/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/10/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/10/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/10/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/10/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/11/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 01/16/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/04/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/25/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/11/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 05/01/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/10/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 07/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/10/2019 Referred to
07/22/2020 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.92. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/10/2019)

Regulations From the Executive in Need of Scrutiny Act of 2019

This bill revises provisions relating to congressional review of agency rulemaking.

Specifically, the bill establishes a congressional approval process for a major rule. A major rule may only take effect if Congress approves of the rule. A major rule is a rule that results in (1) an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more; (2) a major increase in costs or prices for consumers, individual industries, government agencies, or geographic regions; or (3) significant adverse effects on competition, employment, investment, productivity, innovation, or the ability of U.S.-based enterprises to compete with foreign-based enterprises.

In addition, the bill establishes a congressional disapproval process for a nonmajor rule. A nonmajor rule may only take effect if Congress does not disapprove of the rule.