There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

CONFUCIUS Act
Concerns Over Nations Funding University Campus Institutes in the United States Act

Short Titles as Introduced

CONFUCIUS Act
Concerns Over Nations Funding University Campus Institutes in the United States Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish limitations regarding Confucius Institutes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/10/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/10/2020Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/28/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/15/2020-3:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/15/2020-3:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/11/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/10/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2860-2861)
06/10/2020SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2859-2861)
03/28/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/02/2020
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/09/2020
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 06/10/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/28/2019 Referred to
06/10/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.939. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/10/2020)

Concerns Over Nations Funding University Campus Institutes in the United States Act or the CONFUCIUS Act

This bill addresses China's influence on postsecondary educational institutions through Confucius Institutes, which are cultural institutes directly or indirectly funded by the Chinese government.

Specifically, the bill establishes requirements for postsecondary educational institutions that receive federal funding and that have contracts or agreements with Confucius Institutes. The contracts or agreements must include clear provisions that (1) protect the academic freedom of the institutions; (2) prohibit the application of foreign law on the institutions' campuses; and (3) grant full managerial authority of the institutes to the institutions, including full control over teaching plans, activities, research grants, and employment decisions.