There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to facilitate the establishment of additional or expanded public target ranges in certain States.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
04/10/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S2393; text: CR S2393)
03/14/2019By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-8.
02/05/2019Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
01/10/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date
04/30/2019Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
04/30/2019Senate vitiated previous passage.
Action By: Senate
04/10/2019Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2393; text: CR S2393)
Action By: Senate
03/14/2019By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-8.
Action By: Senate
02/05/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 18.
Action By: Senate
02/05/2019Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
02/05/2019Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/10/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works01/10/2019 Referred to
02/05/2019 Markup by
02/05/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-8

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.