There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Holding Foreign Companies Accountable Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Holding Foreign Companies Accountable Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Holding Foreign Companies Accountable Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002 to require certain issuers to disclose to the Securities and Exchange Commission information regarding foreign jurisdictions that prevent the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board from performing inspections under that Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2020Became Public Law No: 116-222. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2020Signed by President.
12/08/2020Presented to President.
12/02/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6031-6032)
05/20/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2520)
05/20/2020Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/28/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2020Became Public Law No: 116-222. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2020Signed by President.
12/08/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/02/2020-4:46pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/02/2020-4:46pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6031-6032)
12/02/2020-4:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 945.
12/02/2020-4:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6031-6035)
12/02/2020-4:23pmHouseMr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/22/2020-11:37amHouseHeld at the desk.
05/22/2020-11:03amHouseReceived in the House.
05/22/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/20/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2520)
05/20/2020SenateS.Amdt.1589 Amendment SA 1589 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/20/2020SenateS.Amdt.1589 Amendment SA 1589 proposed by Senator Kennedy. (consideration: CR S2520; text: CR S2520) In the nature of a substitute.
05/20/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2519-2520)
05/20/2020SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2019SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
06/04/2019SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
03/28/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 03/28/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/18/2020
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/19/2020
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/28/2019 Referred to
12/10/2019 Hearings by
05/20/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.945. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-222 (12/18/2020)

Holding Foreign Companies Accountable Act

This bill requires certain issuers of securities to establish that they are not owned or controlled by a foreign government. Specifically, an issuer must make this certification if the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board is unable to audit specified reports because the issuer has retained a foreign public accounting firm not subject to inspection by the board. Furthermore, if the board is unable to inspect the issuer's public accounting firm for three consecutive years, the issuer's securities are banned from trade on a national exchange or through other methods.

Foreign issuers of securities that use such a firm to prepare an audit report must disclose for each non-inspection year

  • the percentage of shares owned by governmental entities where the issuer is incorporated,
  • whether these governmental entities have a controlling financial interest,
  • information related to any board members who are officials of the Chinese Communist Party, and
  • whether the articles of incorporation of the issuer contain any charter of the Chinese Communist Party.