There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to expand support for police officer family services, stress reduction, and suicide prevention, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/25/2019Became Public Law No: 116-32. (TXT | PDF)
07/25/2019Signed by President.
07/15/2019Presented to President.
07/10/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5329)
05/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2948; text: CR S2948)
05/09/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment. Without written report.
04/03/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/25/2019Became Public Law No: 116-32. (TXT | PDF)
07/25/2019Signed by President.
07/15/2019SenatePresented to President.
07/10/2019-3:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/10/2019-3:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5329)
07/10/2019-3:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 998.
07/10/2019-3:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5329-5331)
07/10/2019-3:32pmHouseMs. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/31/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/20/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/20/2019-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2948; text: CR S2948)
05/09/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 81.
05/09/2019SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment. Without written report.
05/09/2019SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/03/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/03/2019 Referred to
05/09/2019 Markup by
05/09/2019 Reported by
House Judiciary05/20/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/31/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.998. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/10/2019)

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes for FY2020-FY2024 and revises Department of Justice grants to provide family support services to law enforcement personnel.

Among other changes, the bill allows grants to support additional services such as suicide prevention and mental health programs.