There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution calling for credible, transparent, and safe elections in Nigeria, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/14/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S1393-1394)
02/14/2019Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
02/19/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/19/2019-2:33pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/15/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/14/2019SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1393-1394)
02/14/2019SenateS.Amdt.191 Amendment SA 191 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
02/14/2019SenateS.Amdt.191 Amendment SA 191 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S1393; text: CR S1393) To amend the preamble.
02/14/2019SenateS.Amdt.190 Amendment SA 190 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
02/14/2019SenateS.Amdt.190 Amendment SA 190 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S1393; text: CR S1393) To provide a complete substitute.
02/14/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1393-1394)
02/14/2019SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2019SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 01/17/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 02/13/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/16/2019 Referred to
02/14/2019 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs02/19/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.1. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (02/14/2019)

This concurrent resolution expresses support for peace and democracy in Nigeria and calls on Nigeria's government and political parties to take all actions to ensure that elections are credible, transparent, and peaceful in order to support the will of the people. It also calls on the government to respect the impartiality of the Independent National Electoral Commission and take measures to combat vote buying.