There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution recognizing that Chinese telecommunications companies such as Huawei and ZTE pose serious threats to the national security of the United States and its allies.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/09/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
03/28/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/09/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 136.
Action By: Senate
07/09/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
06/25/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/28/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2094-2095)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/28/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 03/28/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/07/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations03/28/2019 Referred to
06/25/2019 Markup by
07/09/2019 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.10.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.10. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (07/09/2019)

This concurrent resolution recognizes Chinese telecommunications companies, specifically Huawei and ZTE, as significant threats to national security. The resolution calls on the United States and its allies to limit the risks associated with use of these companies' products, primarily by identifying effective and reliable alternatives.