Text: S.Con.Res.15 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (06/05/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. CON. RES. 15


Expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2019, as “Honoring the Nation’s First Responders Day”.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 1, 2019

Ms. Warren (for herself, Mr. Cotton, Mr. Johnson, Mr. Peters, Ms. Rosen, and Mr. Lankford) submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs

June 4, 2019

Reported by Mr. Johnson, without amendment

June 5, 2019

Considered and agreed to


CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Expressing support for the designation of October 28, 2019, as “Honoring the Nation’s First Responders Day”.

    Whereas first responders include professional and volunteer fire, police, emergency medical technician, and paramedic workers in the United States;

    Whereas, according to a 2017 compilation of data on the Emergency Services Sector in the United States by the Department of Homeland Security, “The first responder community comprises an estimated 4.6 million career and volunteer professionals within five primary disciplines: Law Enforcement, Fire and Rescue Services, Emergency Medical Services, Emergency Management, and Public Works.”;

    Whereas first responders deserve to be recognized for their commitment to safety, defense, and honor; and

    Whereas October 28, 2019, would be an appropriate day to establish as “Honoring the Nation’s First Responders Day”: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), That Congress—

(1) supports the designation of October 28, 2019, as “Honoring the Nation’s First Responders Day”;

(2) honors and recognizes the contributions of first responders; and

(3) encourages the people of the United States to observe Honoring the Nation’s First Responders Day with appropriate ceremonies and activities that promote awareness of the contributions of first responders in the United States.


Share This Section