There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution honoring the 75th Anniversary of the Battle of the Bulge fought during World War II, recognizing the valiant efforts of the Allied Forces in December 1944, and remembering those who made the ultimate sacrifice, all of which contributed to the Allied victory in the European Theater.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7034)
12/12/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
07/31/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/13/2019-4:02pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/13/2019-4:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/13/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/12/2019SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7034)
12/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.1256 Amendment SA 1256 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.1256 Amendment SA 1256 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cramer. (consideration: CR S7034; text: CR S7034) To add language to the preamble.
12/12/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7033-7034)
12/12/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 326.
12/12/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
12/11/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
07/31/2019SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5259-5260)

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 07/31/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 12/03/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 12/09/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations07/31/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
12/12/2019 Reported by

As of 10/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.Con.Res.23 - A concurrent resolution honoring the 75th Anniversary of the Battle of the Bulge fought during World War II, recognizing the valiant efforts of the Allied Forces in December 1944, and remembering those who made the ultimate sacrifice, all of which contributed to the Allied victory in the European Theater.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.23. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (12/12/2019)

This concurrent resolution commemorates, on December 16, 2019, the 75th anniversary of World War II's Battle of the Bulge. The resolution also recognizes the valiant efforts of the Allied Forces and expresses remembrance of those who made the ultimate sacrifice for the Allied victory in the European Theater.