There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution recognizing the 50th anniversary of the Food and Nutrition Service of the Department of Agriculture.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/31/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5275; text: CR S5260)
07/31/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date Chamber
08/09/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/02/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
08/02/2019-11:04amHouseReceived in the House.
08/01/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/31/2019SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5275; text: CR S5260)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/31/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture08/02/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations08/09/2019 Referred to

As of 01/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.Con.Res.24 - A concurrent resolution recognizing the 50th anniversary of the Food and Nutrition Service of the Department of Agriculture.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.24. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (07/31/2019)

This concurrent resolution recognizes the valuable historic and continued contributions of the Food and Nutrition Service and its employees to the nutrition, health, and well-being of the people of the United States.