There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution to establish the Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies for the inauguration of the President-elect and Vice President-elect of the United States on January 20, 2021


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H2557)
05/06/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2296; text: CR S2295)
05/06/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/26/2020-2:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/26/2020-2:45pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2557)
06/26/2020-2:43pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2557)
06/26/2020-2:43pmHouseMrs. Davis (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
05/08/2020-10:43amHouseHeld at the desk.
05/08/2020-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
05/08/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/06/2020SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2296; text: CR S2295)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/06/2020

Committees (0)

As of 01/26/2021 text has not been received for S.Con.Res.38 - A concurrent resolution to establish the Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies for the inauguration of the President-elect and Vice President-elect of the United States on January 20, 2021

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.38.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.38. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (06/26/2020)

This concurrent resolution establishes a Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies to make the necessary arrangements for the inauguration of the President-elect and Vice President-elect of the United States on January 20, 2021.