There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed foreign military sale to the United Arab Emirates of certain defense articles and services.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/20/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 45. Record Vote Number: 179.(text: CR S4143)
06/19/2019Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
06/20/2019-4:27pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/20/2019-3:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/20/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 45. Record Vote Number: 179. (text: CR S4143)
06/20/2019SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4142-4143)
06/19/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3831-3834)
06/19/2019SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations06/05/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Discharged from

As of 10/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.J.Res.30 - A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed foreign military sale to the United Arab Emirates of certain defense articles and services.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.30. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/20/2019)

This joint resolution prohibits the proposed sale of various defense articles and related support services to the United Arab Emirates, as described in Transmittal No. 19-18 and published in the Congressional Record on June 4, 2019.