There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for congressional disapproval of the proposed export to the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland of certain defense articles and services.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
07/29/2019Failed of passage in Senate over veto: Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 41. Record Vote Number: 233.
07/24/2019Vetoed by President.
07/24/2019Presented to President.
07/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 237 - 190 (Roll no. 488).(text: CR H5940)
06/20/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 178.(text: CR S4142)
06/19/2019Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/29/2019SenateFailed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 41. Record Vote Number: 233.
07/29/2019SenateVeto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5126, S5130-5134)
07/24/2019Vetoed by President.
07/24/2019SenatePresented to President.
07/24/2019SenateVeto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. (text: CR S5053)
07/17/2019-6:17pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 237 - 190 (Roll no. 488). (text: CR H5940)
07/17/2019-6:10pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5976-5977)
07/17/2019-2:05pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J. Res. 38, the Chair put the question on passage of the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Mast demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
07/17/2019-2:04pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/17/2019-1:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with twenty minutes of debate on S.J. Res. 38.
07/17/2019-1:51pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3494 and H. Res. 489 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3494 under a structured rule; provides for consideration of a resolution relating to House Report 116-125, if called up by direction of the Committee on Overisight and Reform; provides for consideration of a joint resolution reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs regarding the Arms Export Control Act; provides for consideration of H. Res. 489.
07/17/2019-1:51pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 491. (consideration: CR H5940-5941)
06/20/2019-4:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/20/2019-3:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/20/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 178. (text: CR S4142)
06/20/2019SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4142)
06/19/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3831-3834)
06/19/2019SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/05/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations06/05/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.J.Res.38. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/17/2019)

This joint resolution prohibits the proposed sale of various defense articles and related support services to Saudi Arabia and the United Kingdom, as described in Executive Communication 1422 and published in the Congressional Record on June 3, 2019.