Text: S.J.Res.52 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (10/29/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S.J. Res. 52 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]

<DOC>





                                                       Calendar No. 278
116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. J. RES. 52

  Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, 
   United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the 
  Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to 
               ``State Relief and Empowerment Waivers''.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             July 31, 2019

   Mr. Warner (for himself, Mr. Wyden, Mrs. Murray, Mr. Cardin, Mrs. 
Shaheen, Ms. Baldwin, Mr. Schumer, Mr. Leahy, Mr. Reed, Mr. Whitehouse, 
  Mr. Brown, Ms. Hirono, Ms. Duckworth, Mr. Sanders, Mr. Tester, Mr. 
Schatz, Ms. Hassan, Ms. Klobuchar, Mr. Udall, Ms. Cantwell, Mr. Murphy, 
 Mr. Merkley, Ms. Rosen, Mr. Casey, Ms. Smith, Mr. Kaine, Mr. Carper, 
 Mr. Durbin, Mr. Coons, Mr. Menendez, Mr. Blumenthal, Mr. Booker, Mr. 
 Markey, Mr. Peters, Mr. Bennet, Mrs. Feinstein, Mr. King, Ms. Cortez 
Masto, Mr. Van Hollen, Mr. Heinrich, Ms. Stabenow, Mrs. Gillibrand, Ms. 
Harris, Ms. Warren, Mr. Jones, Mr. Manchin, and Ms. Sinema) introduced 
 the following joint resolution; which was read twice and referred to 
                        the Committee on Finance

                            October 29, 2019

  Committee discharged by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c), and 
                         placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                            JOINT RESOLUTION


 
  Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, 
   United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the 
  Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to 
               ``State Relief and Empowerment Waivers''.

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress disapproves the 
rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of 
Health and Human Services relating to ``State Relief and Empowerment 
Waivers'' under section 1332 of the Patient Protection and Affordable 
Care Act (issued October 24, 2018, as a guidance and printed at 83 Fed. 
Reg. 53575, and a letter of opinion from the Government Accountability 
Office dated July 15, 2019, printed in the Congressional Record on July 
17, 2019, on pages S4901-S4903, concluding that such guidance is a rule 
under the Congressional Review Act), and such rule shall have no force 
or effect.




                                                       Calendar No. 278

116th CONGRESS

  1st Session

                             S. J. RES. 52

_______________________________________________________________________

                            JOINT RESOLUTION

  Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, 
   United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the 
  Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to 
               ``State Relief and Empowerment Waivers''.

_______________________________________________________________________

                            October 29, 2019

  Committee discharged by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c), and 
                         placed on the calendar

Share This