Text: S.J.Res.52 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/31/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. J. RES. 52


Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to “State Relief and Empowerment Waivers”.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

July 31, 2019

Mr. Warner (for himself, Mr. Wyden, Mrs. Murray, Mr. Cardin, Mrs. Shaheen, Ms. Baldwin, Mr. Schumer, Mr. Leahy, Mr. Reed, Mr. Whitehouse, Mr. Brown, Ms. Hirono, Ms. Duckworth, Mr. Sanders, Mr. Tester, Mr. Schatz, Ms. Hassan, Ms. Klobuchar, Mr. Udall, Ms. Cantwell, Mr. Murphy, Mr. Merkley, Ms. Rosen, Mr. Casey, Ms. Smith, Mr. Kaine, Mr. Carper, Mr. Durbin, Mr. Coons, Mr. Menendez, Mr. Blumenthal, Mr. Booker, Mr. Markey, Mr. Peters, Mr. Bennet, Mrs. Feinstein, Mr. King, Ms. Cortez Masto, Mr. Van Hollen, Mr. Heinrich, Ms. Stabenow, Mrs. Gillibrand, Ms. Harris, Ms. Warren, Mr. Jones, Mr. Manchin, and Ms. Sinema) introduced the following joint resolution; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


JOINT RESOLUTION

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to “State Relief and Empowerment Waivers”.

Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress disapproves the rule submitted by the Secretary of the Treasury and the Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to “State Relief and Empowerment Waivers” under section 1332 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (issued October 24, 2018, as a guidance and printed at 83 Fed. Reg. 53575, and a letter of opinion from the Government Accountability Office dated July 15, 2019, printed in the Congressional Record on July 17, 2019, on pages S4901–S4903, concluding that such guidance is a rule under the Congressional Review Act), and such rule shall have no force or effect.