There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution relating to a national emergency declared by the President on February 15, 2019.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/17/2019Failed of passage in Senate over veto: Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 36. Record Vote Number: 325.
10/15/2019Vetoed by President.
10/04/2019Presented to President.
09/27/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 236 - 174 (Roll no. 553).(text: CR H8061)
09/25/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 41. Record Vote Number: 302.(text: 09/26/2019 CR S5759)
09/25/2019Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/17/2019SenateFailed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 36. Record Vote Number: 325.
10/17/2019SenateVeto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5869, S5874-5875)
10/16/2019SenateVeto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. (text: CR S5852)
10/15/2019Vetoed by President.
10/04/2019SenatePresented to President.
09/27/2019-11:04amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2019-11:04amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 236 - 174 (Roll no. 553). (text: CR H8061)
09/27/2019-10:32amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/27/2019-9:19amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 54.
09/27/2019-9:18amHouseRule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 54 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to commit allowed. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/27/2019-9:18amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 591. (consideration: CR H8061-8071)
09/26/2019-4:53pmHouseRule H. Res. 591 passed House.
09/25/2019-6:52pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/25/2019-6:45pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 591 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 54 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/25/2019-4:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/25/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 41. Record Vote Number: 302. (text: 09/26/2019 CR S5759)
09/25/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5674-5677, S5680-5681)
09/25/2019SenateSenate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/10/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 09/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services09/10/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.J.Res.54. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/27/2019)

This joint resolution terminates the national emergency related to the U.S.-Mexico border, declared by the President on February 15, 2019.