Text: S.J.Res.57 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/15/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S.J. Res. 57 Introduced in Senate (IS)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. J. RES. 57

 Opposing the decision to end certain United States efforts to prevent 
Turkish military operations against Syrian Kurdish forces in Northeast 
                                 Syria.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            October 15, 2019

Mr. Menendez (for himself and Mr. Young) introduced the following joint 
   resolution; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on 
                           Foreign Relations

_______________________________________________________________________

                            JOINT RESOLUTION


 
 Opposing the decision to end certain United States efforts to prevent 
Turkish military operations against Syrian Kurdish forces in Northeast 
                                 Syria.

Whereas thousands of Syrian fighters, including Syrian Kurds, fought 
        courageously with the United States against the brutality of ISIS 
        throughout Syria, liberating nearly one-third of Syrian territory from 
        ISIS' so-called ``caliphate.'';
Whereas, on October 6, 2019, the White House announced ``Turkey will soon be 
        moving forward with its long-planned operation into Northern Syria'' 
        while the ``United States Armed Forces will not support or be involved 
        in the operation, and United States forces . . . will no longer be in 
        the immediate area.'';
Whereas, on October 6, 2019, the White House announced ``Turkey will now be 
        responsible for all ISIS fighters in the area captured over the past two 
        years . . . .'';
Whereas, an October 10, 2019, White House statement said, ``This morning, 
        Turkey, a NATO member, invaded Syria. The United States does not endorse 
        this attack and has made it clear to Turkey that this operation is a bad 
        idea.'';
Whereas Turkey has historically threatened, forcibly displaced, and killed 
        Syrian Kurds, including during military operations in the Afrin 
        District;
Whereas, on August 1, 2019, Special Envoy James Jeffrey stated in reference to 
        the Syrian Kurds and Syrian Democratic Forces (SDF), ``We are committed 
        to defeating ISIS in northeast Syria. The SDF . . . is our partner 
        there. We are committed to those who have fought with us not being 
        attacked and not being harmed by anyone. The President made that clear 
        publicly. That includes our concerns about the Turks.'';
Whereas in January 2019, Director of National Intelligence Dan Coats stated in 
        Congressional testimony that ``The conflicts in Iraq and Syria have 
        generated a large pool of skilled and battle-hardened fighters who 
        remain dispersed throughout the region . . . and the group has returned 
        to its guerilla-warfare roots while continuing to plot attacks and 
        direct its supporters worldwide. ISIS is intent on resurging.'';
Whereas, during the counter-ISIS campaign in Syria, the SDF captured thousands 
        of ISIS fighters, including foreign terrorist fighters from around the 
        world who pose threats to our allies in the region;
Whereas in addition to ISIS fighters in detention approximately 70,000 women and 
        children are currently held at the Al-Hol internally displaced persons 
        camp and at other camps in northeast Syria;
Whereas the Lead Inspector General for Combined Joint Task Force Operation 
        Inherent Resolve stated in August 2019, ISIS is already ``seeking to 
        establish safe haven in al-Hol'' aiming to recruit individuals who are 
        ``susceptible to ISIS messaging, coercion, and enticement.'';
Whereas the SDF has warned the United States and international community that a 
        Turkish incursion into Northeast Syria would significantly decrease the 
        SDF's ability to combat ISIS and to continue providing security and 
        management for ISIS detainees and their family members;
Whereas, on October 6, 2019, President Trump conducted a call with President 
        Erdogan in which, according to the official White House press release, 
        they discussed the upcoming Turkish incursion, and soon after this call, 
        a White House press release announced the withdrawal of the United 
        States military from the immediate area, which was completed within 
        hours; and
Whereas an abrupt withdrawal of United States military personnel from certain 
        parts of Northeast Syria is beneficial to adversaries of the United 
        States government, including Syria, Iran, and Russia: Now, therefore, be 
        it
    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That Congress--
            (1) opposes the decision to end certain United States 
        efforts to prevent Turkish military operations against Syrian 
        Kurdish forces in Northeast Syria;
            (2) calls on Turkish President Erdogan to immediately cease 
        unilateral military action in Northeast Syria and to respect 
        existing agreements relating to Syria;
            (3) calls on the United States to continue supporting 
        Syrian Kurdish communities through humanitarian support, 
        including to those displaced or otherwise affected by ongoing 
        violence in Syria;
            (4) calls on the United States to work to ensure that the 
        Turkish military acts with restraint and respects existing 
        agreements relating to Syria; and
            (5) calls on the White House to present a clear and 
        specific plan for the enduring defeat of ISIS.
                                 <all>

Share This