There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities against the Islamic Republic of Iran that have not been authorized by Congress.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/13/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 45. Record Vote Number: 52.
02/12/2020Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Voice Vote. (Pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1546a).
01/09/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (49)

Date Chamber
02/14/2020-11:07amHouseHeld at the desk.
02/14/2020-11:02amHouseReceived in the House.
02/13/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/13/2020SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 45. Record Vote Number: 52. (text: CR S1061-1062)
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1319 Motion to table amendment SA 1319 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 49. Record Vote Number: 51.
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1320 Motion to table amendment SA 1320 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 46. Record Vote Number: 50.
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1314 Amendment SA 1314 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 7. Record Vote Number: 49.
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1305 Motion to table amendment SA 1305 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 46. Record Vote Number: 48.
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1322 Amendment SA 1322 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 99 - 0. Record Vote Number: 47.
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1301 Amendment SA 1301 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 64 - 34. Record Vote Number: 46.
02/13/2020SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1051-1062)
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1320 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1057-1058)
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1314 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1057)
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1305 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1056-1057)
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1322 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1056)
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1301 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1055-1056)
02/13/2020SenateS.Amdt.1319 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1058)
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1320 Amendment SA 1320 proposed by Senator Cramer for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S1036; text: CR S1036) To amend the findings.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1314 Amendment SA 1314 proposed by Senator Cramer for Senator Risch. (consideration: CR S1036; text: CR S1036) To amend the findings.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1305 Amendment SA 1305 proposed by Senator Cramer for Senator Cotton. (consideration: CR S1036; text: CR S1036) To exempt from the termination requirement United States Armed Forces engaged in operations directed at designated terrorist organizations.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1322 Amendment SA 1322 proposed by Senator Cramer for Senator Reed. (consideration: CR S1036; text: CR S1036) To amend the findings.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1301 Amendment SA 1301 proposed by Senator Cramer for Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S1036; text: CR S1036) To amend the findings.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1319 Amendment SA 1319 proposed by Senator Cramer for Senator Sullivan. (consideration: CR S1036; text: CR S1036) To amend the rule of construction.
02/12/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1012-1015, S1018, S1021-1030, S1033-1036)
02/12/2020SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 45. Record Vote Number: 45. (consideration: CR S1006-1012)
02/12/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 421.
02/12/2020SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Voice Vote. (Pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1546a).
02/12/2020SenateMotion to discharge Senate Committee on Foreign Relations made.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1318 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1317 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1316 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1315 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/12/2020SenateS.Amdt.1314 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1313 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1312 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1311 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1310 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1309 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1308 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1307 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1306 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1305 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1304 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1303 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1302 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1301 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1300 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
02/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1299 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
01/09/2020SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/09/2020 Referred to
02/12/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.68. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/09/2020)

This joint resolution directs the President to terminate the use of U.S. Armed Forces for hostilities against Iran unless explicitly authorized by a congressional declaration of war or a specific authorization for use of military force against Iran.