There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to direct the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/02/2019Failed of passage in Senate over veto: Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 94.
04/16/2019Vetoed by President.
04/16/2019Presented to President.
04/04/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 247 - 175, 1 Present (Roll no. 153).(text: CR H3075-3076)
03/13/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 46. Record Vote Number: 48.(text: CR S1835-1836)
03/13/2019Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber
05/02/2019SenateFailed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 94.
05/02/2019SenateVeto Message considered in Senate.
04/29/2019SenateVeto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk.
04/16/2019Vetoed by President.
04/16/2019SenatePresented to President.
04/04/2019-11:47amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/04/2019-11:47amHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 247 - 175, 1 Present (Roll no. 153). (text: CR H3075-3076)
04/04/2019-11:37amHouseOn motion to commit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 194 - 228, 1 Present (Roll no. 152).
04/04/2019-11:30amHouseThe previous question on the motion to commit with instructions was ordered without objection.
04/04/2019-11:17amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McCaul motion to commit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report to the House an amendment adding a new paragraph after section 1 pertaining to the national security interest of the United States to condemn and oppose the Global Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions Movement targeting Israel, including efforts to target United States companies that are engaged in commercial activities that are legal under United States law.
04/04/2019-11:17amHouseMr. McCaul moved to commit with instructions to the Committee on Foreign Affairs. (text: CR H3081)
04/04/2019-11:15amHousePursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, the House resumed consideration of S.J.Res. 7. (consideration: CR H3081-3083)
04/04/2019-10:18amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S.J. Res 7, the Chair postponed proceedings pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19.
04/04/2019-10:18amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/04/2019-9:45amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 7.
04/04/2019-9:43amHouseRule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
04/04/2019-9:43amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 274. (consideration: CR H3075-3080)
04/01/2019-7:27pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 274 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 7 and H. Res. 271. Rule provides for the previous question to be considered as ordered without intervening motions for both measures except for one hour of debate; one motion to recommit S.J. Res. 7 is allowed. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of April 4, 2019 for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
03/18/2019-12:51pmHouseHeld at the desk.
03/18/2019-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/14/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/13/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 46. Record Vote Number: 48. (text: CR S1835-1836)
03/13/2019SenateS.Amdt.195 Amendment SA 195 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
03/13/2019SenateS.Amdt.194 Motion to table amendment SA 194 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 48. Record Vote Number: 47.
03/13/2019SenateS.Amdt.193 Amendment SA 193 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
03/13/2019SenateS.Amdt.195 Amendment SA 195 proposed by Senator Lee for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S1829-1835; text: CR S1829) To provide a rule of construction regarding intelligence sharing.
03/13/2019SenateS.Amdt.194 Amendment SA 194 proposed by Senator Lee for Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S1829-1835; text: CR S1829) To provide an exception for supporting efforts to defend against ballistic missile, cruise missile, and unmanned aerial vehicle threats to civilian population centers in coalition countries, including locations where citizens and nationals of the United States reside.
03/13/2019SenateS.Amdt.193 Amendment SA 193 proposed by Senator Lee for Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S1829-1835; text: CR S1829) To provide that nothing in the joint resolution may be construed as authorizing the use of military force.
03/13/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1829-1836)
03/13/2019SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/30/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/30/2019 Referred to
03/13/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.J.Res.7. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (03/13/2019)

This joint resolution directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities in or affecting Yemen within 30 days unless Congress authorizes a later withdrawal date, issues a declaration of war, or specifically authorizes the use of the Armed Forces. Prohibited activities include providing in-flight fueling for non-U.S. aircraft conducting missions as part of the conflict in Yemen. This joint resolution shall not affect any military operations directed at Al Qaeda.

The President must submit to Congress, within 90 days, reports assessing the risks that would be posed (1) if the United States were to cease supporting operations with respect to the conflict in Yemen, and (2) if Saudi Arabia were to cease sharing Yemen-related intelligence with the United States.