There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution recognizing the duty of the Federal Government to create a Green New Deal.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
03/26/2019Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 0 - 57. Record Vote Number: 52. (CR S1971)
Action By: Senate
03/26/2019Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1964)
Action By: Senate
03/14/2019Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S1882)
Action By: Senate
03/14/2019Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1882)
Action By: Senate
02/14/2019Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 27.
Action By: Senate
02/13/2019Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S1327-1328)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 09/17/2019 text has not been received for S.J.Res.8 - A joint resolution recognizing the duty of the Federal Government to create a Green New Deal.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (53)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.8. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/13/2019)

This joint resolution declares that the government has a duty to create a Green New Deal with the goals of

  • achieving net-zero greenhouse gas emissions;
  • establishing millions of high-wage jobs and ensuring economic security for all;
  • investing in infrastructure and industry;
  • securing clean air and water, climate and community resiliency, healthy food, access to nature, and a sustainable environment for all; and
  • promoting justice and equality.

The joint resolution calls for accomplishment of these goals through a 10-year national mobilization effort. The resolution also enumerates the goals and projects of the mobilization effort, including

  • building smart power grids (i.e., power grids that enable customers to reduce their power use during peak demand periods);
  • upgrading all existing buildings and constructing new buildings to achieve maximum energy and water efficiency;
  • removing pollution and greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation and agricultural sectors;
  • cleaning up existing hazardous waste and abandoned sites;
  • ensuring businesspersons are free from unfair competition; and
  • providing higher education, high-quality health care, and affordable, safe, and adequate housing to all.