There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution opposing efforts to delegitimize the State of Israel and the Global Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions Movement targeting Israel.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/25/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/25/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1942)

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/25/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/26/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/26/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/26/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/26/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/26/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/26/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/26/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 03/26/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/26/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 03/26/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/26/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/26/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 03/26/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 03/26/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/26/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/26/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/26/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/27/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/27/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/27/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 03/27/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 03/27/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/27/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 03/27/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/28/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 04/01/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/01/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/01/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/02/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/04/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/08/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 04/08/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/09/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 04/09/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/11/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 04/29/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/30/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/30/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/02/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/02/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/02/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/02/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/06/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/07/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 05/07/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/08/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 05/08/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/09/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/14/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/16/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/21/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/21/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 06/03/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 06/04/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/13/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 06/13/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 06/18/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/24/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/25/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/26/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/26/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/08/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/15/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/17/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/17/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/22/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 09/11/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/25/2019 Referred to

As of 10/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.120 - A resolution opposing efforts to delegitimize the State of Israel and the Global Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions Movement targeting Israel.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.120. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/25/2019)

This resolution opposes the Global Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions Movement (BDS) and other efforts targeting Israel, and states that BDS undermines the possibility for a negotiated solution to the Israeli-Palestinian conflict. The resolution urges both sides to return to direct negotiations and expresses support for a solution resulting in the state of Israel existing alongside a democratic Palestinian state.