There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing the gratitude and appreciation of the Senate for the acts of heroism and valor by the members of the United States Armed Forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/04/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3199-3200; text: CR S3199-3200)
05/23/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
04/02/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
06/04/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3199-3200; text: CR S3199-3200)
05/23/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 98.
05/23/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
05/22/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
04/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2193)

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/02/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/04/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 04/04/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/04/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/04/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 04/04/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 04/04/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/04/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/04/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 04/04/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/04/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 04/04/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/04/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/04/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 04/04/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/04/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/04/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 04/09/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/09/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/09/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 04/09/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 04/09/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 04/09/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 04/29/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 04/29/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 04/29/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 04/29/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 04/29/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 04/29/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 04/29/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/29/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 04/29/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/29/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/06/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/06/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/16/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/20/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/20/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 05/20/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/20/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/20/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 05/20/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/22/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/22/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/22/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/23/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/03/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/02/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
05/23/2019 Reported by

As of 09/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.135 - A resolution expressing the gratitude and appreciation of the Senate for the acts of heroism and valor by the members of the United States Armed Forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.135. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/04/2019)

This resolution recognizes the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing of the allied forces on D-Day, June 6, 1944, at Normandy, France, during World War II.

The resolution

  • expresses appreciation to the members of the U.S. Armed Forces who participated in the operations,
  • thanks the young people of Normandy and the United States for their involvement in events celebrating the anniversary of the Normandy landings,
  • recognizes the efforts of France and the people of Normandy to preserve the world heritage represented by the Normandy beaches and the sunken material remains of the landings by inscribing these on the UNESCO World Heritage List, and
  • requests the President to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the United States to observe the 75th anniversary.