Text: S.Res.144 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (05/02/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 144


Designating May 5, 2019, as the “National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls”.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

April 4, 2019

Mr. Daines (for himself, Mr. Tester, Mr. Hoeven, Mr. Rounds, Ms. Warren, Mr. Gardner, Mr. Crapo, Mr. Lankford, Ms. Murkowski, Mr. Udall, Ms. Cortez Masto, Mr. Wyden, and Mr. Cramer) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary

May 2, 2019

Committee discharged; considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Designating May 5, 2019, as the “National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls”.

    Whereas, according to a study commissioned by the Department of Justice, in some Tribal communities, American Indian women face murder rates that are more than 10 times the national average murder rate;

    Whereas, according to the most recently available data from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, in 2017, homicide was the sixth leading cause of death for American Indian and Alaska Native females between 1 and 44 years of age;

    Whereas little data exist on the number of missing American Indian and Alaska Native women in the United States;

    Whereas, on July 5, 2013, Hanna Harris, a member of the Northern Cheyenne Tribe, was reported missing by her family in Lame Deer, Montana;

    Whereas the body of Hanna Harris was found 5 days after she went missing;

    Whereas Hanna Harris was determined to have been raped and murdered, and the individuals accused of committing those crimes were convicted;

    Whereas the case of Hanna Harris is an example of many similar cases; and

    Whereas Hanna Harris was born on May 5, 1992: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) designates May 5, 2019, as the “National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls”; and

(2) calls on the people of the United States and interested groups—

(A) to commemorate the lives of missing and murdered American Indian and Alaska Native women whose cases are documented and undocumented in public records and the media; and

(B) to demonstrate solidarity with the families of victims in light of those tragedies.