Text: S.Res.152 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/09/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 152


Expressing the importance of the United States alliance with the Republic of Korea and the contributions of Korean Americans in the United States.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

April 9, 2019

Mr. Lankford (for himself, Mr. Menendez, Mr. Gardner, and Mr. Markey) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations


RESOLUTION

Expressing the importance of the United States alliance with the Republic of Korea and the contributions of Korean Americans in the United States.

    Whereas the United States and the Republic of Korea enjoy a comprehensive alliance partnership, founded in shared strategic interests and cemented by a commitment to democratic values;

    Whereas the United States and the Republic of Korea work closely together to promote international peace and security, economic prosperity, human rights, and the rule of law;

    Whereas the relationship between the United States and the Republic of Korea goes as far back as Korea’s Chosun Dynasty, when the United States and Korea established diplomatic relations under the 1882 Treaty of Peace, Amity, Commerce, and Navigation;

    Whereas, on August 15, 1948, the Provisional Government of the Republic of Korea, established on April 11, 1919, was dissolved and transitioned to the First Republic of Korea, their first independent government;

    Whereas United States military personnel have maintained a continuous presence on the Korean Peninsula since the Mutual Defense Treaty Between the United States and the Republic of Korea (5 UST 2368) was signed at Washington on October 1, 1953;

    Whereas, on May 7, 2013, the United States and the Republic of Korea signed a Joint Declaration in Commemoration of the 60th Anniversary of the Alliance Between the Republic of Korea and the United States;

    Whereas 63 years ago the Treaty of Friendship, Commerce, and Navigation between the United States and the Republic of Korea, with Protocol (8 UST 2217) was signed at Seoul on November 28, 1956;

    Whereas the economic relationship between the United States and the Republic of Korea is deep and mutually beneficial to both countries;

    Whereas the Republic of Korea is the United States seventh-largest trading partner;

    Whereas the Republic of Korea is the 5th fastest growing source of foreign direct investment in the United States;

    Whereas the United States is the largest source of foreign direct investment in the Republic of Korea;

    Whereas, on January 13, 1903, 102 pioneer Korean immigrants arrived in the United States, initiating the first chapter of Korean immigration to America;

    Whereas the over 2,000,000 Korean Americans living in the United States contribute to the diversity and prosperity of our Nation, participate in all facets of American life, and have made significant contributions to the economic vitality of the United States;

    Whereas members of the Korean American community serve with distinction in the United States Armed Forces;

    Whereas Korean Americans continue to build and strengthen the alliance between the United States and the Republic of Korea; and

    Whereas the Asia Reassurance Initiative Act (Public Law 115–409), signed into law on December 31, 2018, states that the United States Government—

    (1) is committed to the Mutual Defense Treaty Between the United States and the Republic of Korea and all related and subsequent bilateral security agreements and arrangements concluded on or before the date of the enactment of that Act;

    (2) recognizes the vital role of the alliance between the United States and South Korea in promoting peace and security in the Indo-Pacific region; and

    (3) calls for the strengthening and broadening of diplomatic, economic, and security ties between the United States and the Republic of Korea: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) recognizes the vital role the alliance of the United States and the Republic of Korea plays in promoting peace and security in the Indo-Pacific region;

(2) calls for the strengthening and broadening of diplomatic, economic, and security ties between the United States and the Republic of Korea; and

(3) reaffirms the United States alliance with the Republic of Korea is central to advancing United States interests and engagement in the region, based on shared commitments democracy, free-market economics, human rights, and the rule of law.


Share This