There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution recognizing the contributions of defense laboratories to the technological dominance of the United States Armed Forces and supporting the designation of April 25, 2019, as "Department of Defense Laboratory Day 2019".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/02/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 4/11/2019 S2439-2440)
05/02/2019Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2623)
04/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
05/02/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/11/2019 S2439-2440)
05/02/2019Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2623)
04/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services04/11/2019 Referred to
05/02/2019 Discharged from

As of 08/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.160 - A resolution recognizing the contributions of defense laboratories to the technological dominance of the United States Armed Forces and supporting the designation of April 25, 2019, as "Department of Defense Laboratory Day 2019".


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.160. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (05/02/2019)

This resolution supports the designation of April 25, 2019, as Department of Defense Laboratory Day 2019 and recognizes the contributions of the Department of Defense laboratories.