There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution encouraging a swift transfer of power by the military to a civilian-led political authority in the Republic of the Sudan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/09/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4736-4739; text: CR S4738-4739)
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
05/02/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date
07/09/2019S.Amdt.909 Amendment SA 909 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/09/2019S.Amdt.909 Amendment SA 909 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S4737-4738; text: CR S4737-4738) To amend the preamble.
07/09/2019The committee amendment to the preamble withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
07/09/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4736-4739; text: CR S4738-4739)
07/09/2019S.Amdt.908 Amendment SA 908 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/09/2019S.Amdt.908 Amendment SA 908 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S4736-4737; text: CR S4737) In the nature of a substitute.
07/09/2019The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
07/09/2019Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
06/03/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 106.
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
05/22/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
05/02/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2622)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/02/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
06/03/2019 Reported by

As of 10/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.188 - A resolution encouraging a swift transfer of power by the military to a civilian-led political authority in the Republic of the Sudan, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.