There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution celebrating the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the 19th Amendment, providing for women's suffrage, to the Constitution of the United States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/04/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132.(text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928)
06/04/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3200)
05/16/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
06/04/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132. (text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928)
06/04/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3200)
05/16/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 05/16/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 05/16/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 05/21/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/21/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/21/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/21/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 05/21/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 05/21/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/21/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/21/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/21/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/21/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 05/21/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/21/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/21/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/21/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/21/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/21/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/21/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 05/21/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/21/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/23/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/23/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/23/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/23/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/23/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/23/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/23/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/23/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/23/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/23/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/23/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/23/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/03/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/03/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/03/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/03/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/03/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/03/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/03/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/03/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/03/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/03/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/03/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/03/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/03/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/03/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/03/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 06/03/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/03/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/03/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/04/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 06/04/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 06/04/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 06/04/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/16/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.212. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/04/2019)

This resolution celebrates the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution, providing for women's suffrage. The resolution also reaffirms the desire of Congress to continue strengthening democratic participation.