There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution designating September 2019 as National Democracy Month as a time to reflect on the contributions of the system of government of the United States to a more free and stable world.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: 06/19/2019 CR S3849-3850)
09/26/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5759-5760)
06/19/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/26/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/19/2019 CR S3849-3850)
09/26/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5759-5760)
06/19/2019Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/19/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/25/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/26/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/26/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/26/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/27/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 06/27/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/08/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/10/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/15/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/15/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/15/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/15/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/16/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 07/16/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/16/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/16/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/18/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/18/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 07/22/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/22/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/23/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/24/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 07/25/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 07/29/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/30/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/30/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 07/30/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/30/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/30/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/30/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/30/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/30/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/30/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/30/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/31/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/31/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 08/01/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 08/01/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/09/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/10/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/11/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 09/11/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 09/11/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 09/11/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 09/12/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 09/12/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 09/12/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 09/12/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/17/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 09/17/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 09/17/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/23/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/23/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/25/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/25/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 09/25/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/19/2019 Referred to
09/26/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.252. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (09/26/2019)

This resolution designates September 2019 as National Democracy Month.