There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A resolution recognizing the importance of sustained United States leadership to accelerating global progress against maternal and child malnutrition and supporting the commitment of the United States Agency for International Development to reducing global malnutrition through the Multi-Sectoral Nutrition Strategy.

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution recognizing the importance of sustained United States leadership to accelerating global progress against maternal and child malnutrition and supporting the commitment of the United States Agency for International Development to global nutrition through the Multi-Sectoral Nutrition Strategy.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/14/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S198-199)
12/18/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
06/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
01/14/2020Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S198-199)
12/18/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 379.
12/18/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
12/11/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
06/24/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4460)

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/24/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/24/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/25/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/25/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/26/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/15/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/16/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 07/22/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 07/24/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 10/15/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 11/18/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 11/18/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 12/04/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 12/05/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/09/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations06/24/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
12/18/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.260. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (12/18/2019)

This resolution expresses support for increased U.S. efforts to combat malnutrition among women and children around the world.