There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing solidarity with Falun Gong practitioners who have lost lives, freedoms, and other rights for adhering to their beliefs and practices, and condemning the practice of non-consenting organ harvesting, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
07/11/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4809-4810)

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 07/11/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/15/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/17/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 07/17/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/22/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/29/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 07/29/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 07/31/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/10/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 09/10/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 09/16/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/17/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/18/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/18/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/22/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/27/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 07/01/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/20/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/10/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/10/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/16/2020
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 10/19/2020
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/19/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 10/19/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations07/11/2019 Referred to

As of 10/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.274 - A resolution expressing solidarity with Falun Gong practitioners who have lost lives, freedoms, and other rights for adhering to their beliefs and practices, and condemning the practice of non-consenting organ harvesting, and for other purposes.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.274. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/11/2019)

This resolution condemns nonconsensual organ harvesting of prisoners in China and calls on China to immediately cease the persecution and imprisonment of Falun Gong practitioners. (Falun Gong is a religious practice that is denounced by the Chinese government.)