There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution to support the Global Fund to fight AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria, and the Sixth Replenishment.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/02/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6790-6791)
12/02/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6790-6791; text: 12/10/2019 CR S6955)
09/26/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments and with a preamble. Without written report.
09/18/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
12/02/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6790-6791; text: 12/10/2019 CR S6955)
09/26/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 236.
09/26/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments and with a preamble. Without written report.
09/25/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
09/18/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5581)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations09/18/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
09/26/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.