Text: S.Res.33 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (02/06/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. Res. 33 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. RES. 33

           Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            January 28, 2019

    Mr. Toomey (for himself, Mr. Manchin, Mr. Rubio, and Mr. Casey) 
submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee 
               on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions

                            February 6, 2019

             Committee discharged; considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
           Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools.

Whereas Catholic schools in the United States are internationally acclaimed for 
        their academic excellence and provide students with more than just an 
        exceptional scholastic education;
Whereas Catholic schools instill a broad, values-added education emphasizing the 
        lifelong development of moral, intellectual, physical, and social values 
        in young people in the United States;
Whereas Catholic schools serve the United States by providing a diverse student 
        population, from all regions of the country and all socioeconomic 
        backgrounds, a strong academic and moral foundation, and of that student 
        population--

    (1) more than 38 percent of students are from racial and ethnic 
minority backgrounds; and

    (2) 19 percent of students are from non-Catholic families;

Whereas Catholic schools are an affordable option for parents, particularly in 
        underserved urban areas;
Whereas Catholic schools produce students who are strongly dedicated to their 
        faith, values, families, and communities by providing an intellectually 
        stimulating environment rich in spiritual, character, and moral 
        development;
Whereas Catholic schools are committed to community service, producing graduates 
        who hold ``helping others'' as a core value;
Whereas the total Catholic school student enrollment for the 2018-2019 academic 
        year is almost 1,800,000, with a student-teacher ratio of 12 to 1;
Whereas the Catholic high school graduation rate is 99 percent, with 87 percent 
        of graduates attending 4-year colleges;
Whereas, in the 1972 pastoral message concerning Catholic education, the 
        National Conference of Catholic Bishops stated: ``Education is one of 
        the most important ways by which the Church fulfills its commitment to 
        the dignity of the person and building of community. Community is 
        central to education ministry, both as a necessary condition and an 
        ardently desired goal. The educational efforts of the Church, therefore, 
        must be directed to forming persons-in-community; for the education of 
        the individual Christian is important not only to his solitary destiny, 
        but also the destinies of the many communities in which he lives.'';
Whereas the week of January 27, 2019, to February 2, 2019, has been designated 
        as National Catholic Schools Week by the National Catholic Educational 
        Association and the United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, and 
        January 30, 2019, has been designated National Appreciation Day for 
        Catholic Schools;
Whereas National Catholic Schools Week was first established in 1974 and has 
        been celebrated annually for the past 45 years;
Whereas, while Catholic schools must work hard to maintain enrollment, the 
        demand and enthusiasm for Catholic schools remains strong;
Whereas 30 percent of Catholic schools have waiting lists for admission, and new 
        schools are opening across the United States; and
Whereas the theme for National Catholic Schools Week 2019 is Catholic Schools: 
        Learn. Serve. Lead. Succeed.: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the Senate--
            (1) supports the goals of National Catholic Schools Week, 
        an event--
                    (A) cosponsored by the National Catholic 
                Educational Association and the United States 
                Conference of Catholic Bishops; and
                    (B) established to recognize the vital 
                contributions of the thousands of Catholic elementary 
                and secondary schools in the United States;
            (2) applauds the National Catholic Educational Association 
        and the United States Conference of Catholic Bishops on the 
        selection of a theme that all people can celebrate; and
            (3) supports--
                    (A) the continued dedication of Catholic schools, 
                students, parents, and teachers across the United 
                States to academic excellence; and
                    (B) the key role that Catholic schools, students, 
                parents, and teachers across the United States play in 
                promoting and ensuring a brighter, stronger future for 
                the United States.
                                 <all>

Share This