There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution supporting democratic principles and standards in Bolivia and throughout Latin America.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/10/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S2393-2395; text: CR S2394-2395)
04/04/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
01/31/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
04/10/2019Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2393-2395; text: CR S2394-2395)
04/04/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 58.
04/04/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
04/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
01/31/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S809-810)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/31/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/31/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/31/2019 Referred to
04/03/2019 Markup by
04/04/2019 Reported by

As of 01/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.35 - A resolution supporting democratic principles and standards in Bolivia and throughout Latin America.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.35. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/31/2019)

This resolution expresses support for democratic transition and peaceful elections in Bolivia and throughout Latin America, and calls on the Government of Bolivia to maintain international democratic norms and presidential term limits in the October 2019 election.