There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution reaffirming the support of the United States for the people of the Republic of South Sudan and calling on all parties to uphold their commitments to peace and dialogue as outlined in the 2018 revitalized peace agreement.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/15/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S251-252)
12/17/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
10/22/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
01/15/2020Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S251-252)
12/17/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
12/17/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
12/11/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/22/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5975-5976)

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations10/22/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by

As of 04/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.371 - A resolution reaffirming the support of the United States for the people of the Republic of South Sudan and calling on all parties to uphold their commitments to peace and dialogue as outlined in the 2018 revitalized peace agreement.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.371. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (01/15/2020)

This resolution expresses the Senate's support for a sustainable peace and democracy in South Sudan. Further, it calls on the United States and other countries to take certain steps to implement the 2018 revitalized peace agreement, monitor human rights abuses and corruption, and support the renewal of an arms embargo in South Sudan.