There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution celebrating the 30th anniversary of the fall of the Berlin Wall, the reunification of both Germany and Europe, and the spread of democracy around the world.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S77; text: CR S77)
12/17/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
10/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
01/08/2020Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S77; text: CR S77)
12/17/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 340.
12/17/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
12/11/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/24/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 10/24/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 10/24/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 10/24/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 10/30/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/10/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/12/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations10/24/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.385. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (01/08/2020)

This resolution recognizes the 30th anniversary of the fall of the Berlin Wall as the start of German reunification and democratic change in much of the rest of the world. It values the efforts of German and European citizens to reinvigorate the united Germany and recognizes Germany for its steadfast alliance and friendship with the United States.