There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution recognizing the 40th anniversary of the Iran Hostage Crisis, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S80-81; text: CR 10/31/2019 S6340)
12/17/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
10/31/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
01/08/2020Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80-81; text: CR 10/31/2019 S6340)
12/17/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 368.
12/17/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
12/11/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/31/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations10/31/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by

As of 11/26/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.395 - A resolution recognizing the 40th anniversary of the Iran Hostage Crisis, and for other purposes.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.395. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (01/08/2020)

This resolution recognizes the 40th anniversary of the Iran Hostage Crisis. The resolution also honors the suffering of the hostages and sacrifices of those who attempted to rescue them.