There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution calling for the global repeal of blasphemy, heresy, and apostasy laws.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/19/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7851-7852)
12/19/2020Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
12/19/2020Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7851-7852)
12/19/2020S.Amdt.2720 Amendment SA 2720 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2020S.Amdt.2720 Amendment SA 2720 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S7850-7851; text: CR S7851) To amend the preamble.
12/19/2020S.Amdt.2719 Amendment SA 2719 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2020S.Amdt.2719 Amendment SA 2719 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S7850-7851; text: CR S7850-7851) In the nature of a substitute.
12/19/2020Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7850-7852)
12/19/2020Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2019Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S7213)

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 12/19/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 02/05/2020
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 02/12/2020
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 02/27/2020
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 02/27/2020
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 07/02/2020
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations12/19/2019 Referred to
12/19/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.458. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (12/19/2020)

This resolution calls on the President and the Department of State to (1) encourage the repeal of blasphemy, heresy, and apostasy laws in bilateral discussions between the United States and countries that have such laws; (2) designate countries that enforce such laws as countries of particular concern for religious freedom; and (3) oppose efforts by the United Nations to implement an international anti-blasphemy norm. The resolution also calls on the governments of countries that enforce such laws to amend or repeal them and to release anyone imprisoned pursuant to them.