Text: S.Res.468 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (01/13/2020)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. Res. 468 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  2d Session
S. RES. 468

 Relative to the death of the Honorable Jocelyn Burdick, former United 
             States Senator for the State of North Dakota.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            January 13, 2020

    Mr. Hoeven (for himself and Mr. Cramer) submitted the following 
             resolution; which was considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Relative to the death of the Honorable Jocelyn Burdick, former United 
             States Senator for the State of North Dakota.

Whereas Jocelyn Burdick was born in Fargo, North Dakota, and attended Principia 
        College and Northwestern University;
Whereas Jocelyn Burdick began her career as a radio announcer in Moorhead, 
        Minnesota, served as a trustee to the newly reorganized Lake Agassiz 
        Arts Council in 1977, was a Sunday school teacher and devoted member of 
        the Christian Science Church, was president of the Parent Teacher 
        Association, recorded public service announcements raising awareness of 
        substance abuse and drunk driving, and was nationally recognized for her 
        philanthropy on behalf of the Gamma Phi Beta sorority;
Whereas, on September 12, 1992, Jocelyn Burdick became the first woman from the 
        State of North Dakota to serve in the United States Senate when then-
        Governor George Sinner appointed her to fill the seat of her late 
        husband, Quentin Burdick;
Whereas Jocelyn Burdick was sworn in on September 16, 1992, and served in the 
        United States Senate until December 14, 1992; and
Whereas, during her time as United States Senator for North Dakota, Jocelyn 
        Burdick served the people of North Dakota and continued the agenda of 
        her late husband, including by supporting the enactment of the Federal 
        Facility Compliance Act of 1992 (Public Law 102-386; 106 Stat. 1505), 
        helping to establish the Quentin N. Burdick Indian Health Program at the 
        University of North Dakota, supporting health care training programs for 
        Native Americans, and helping to secure funding for the Federal 
        courthouse in Fargo named after her late husband: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That--
            (1) the Senate has heard with profound sorrow and deep 
        regret the announcement of the death of the Honorable Jocelyn 
        Burdick, former Member of the United States Senate;
            (2) the Secretary of the Senate communicate this resolution 
        to the House of Representatives and transmit an enrolled copy 
        thereof to the family of the deceased; and
            (3) when the Senate adjourns today, it stand adjourned as a 
        further mark of respect to the memory of the Honorable Jocelyn 
        Burdick.
                                 <all>

Share This Section