There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution improving procedures for the consideration of nominations in the Senate.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/13/2019Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt without amendment. Without written report.
02/06/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date
04/02/2019Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. Res. 50 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 57) entered in Senate.
04/02/2019Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S2177)
04/02/2019Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S2163)
03/28/2019Cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (CR S2082)
03/28/2019Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S2082)
02/13/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 24.
02/13/2019Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt without amendment. Without written report.
02/13/2019Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/06/2019Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S924)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/06/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration02/06/2019 Referred to
02/13/2019 Markup by
02/13/2019 Reported by

As of 10/22/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.50 - A resolution improving procedures for the consideration of nominations in the Senate.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.50. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (02/13/2019)

This resolution limits Senate post-cloture consideration to two hours for certain nominations. This limitation applies to a nomination to U.S. district courts, to the U.S. Court of Federal Claims, or to an executive branch position that is not

  • at level I of the Executive Schedule; or
  • as a member of the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, the Securities and Exchange Commission, the Federal Election Commission, the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, the Federal Trade Commission, the National Labor Relations Board, the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, the Consumer Product Safety Commission, the Federal Communications Commission, the Surface Transportation Board, the Nuclear Regulatory Commission, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, or the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System.

Senate post-cloture consideration of all nominations shall be equally divided between the majority and the minority leaders.