There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States should continue to support the people of Nicaragua in their peaceful efforts to promote the restoration of democracy and the defense of human rights, and use the tools under United States law to increase political and economic pressure on the government of Daniel Ortega.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/16/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019)
06/03/2020Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
03/02/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
06/16/2020Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019)
06/03/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 471.
06/03/2020Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
05/21/2020Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
03/02/2020Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1259-1260)

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/02/2020
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/02/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 03/02/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 03/02/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/02/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/02/2020 Referred to
05/21/2020 Markup by
06/03/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Res.525. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/16/2020)

This resolution calls on Nicaragua to release all political prisoners and cease all acts of repression against dissenting voices, encourages efforts to advance electoral reforms in Nicaragua, and urges Nicaragua to implement measures to limit the spread of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) in the country. It also exhorts the U.S. government to investigate and hold accountable those responsible for the death of U.S. citizen Eddy Montes, who was shot and killed while in the custody of Nicaraguan police.