There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing appreciation and support for essential employees with disabilities or who are blind during the COVID-19 pandemic and beyond.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/10/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
08/10/2020Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5379-5380)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 08/10/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 08/10/2020
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 08/10/2020
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 09/14/2020
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/23/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 09/24/2020
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 10/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions08/10/2020 Referred to

As of 10/21/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.Res.679 - A resolution expressing appreciation and support for essential employees with disabilities or who are blind during the COVID-19 pandemic and beyond.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.679. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/10/2020)

This resolution recognizes the essential work performed by individuals with disabilities or who are blind during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic. It recognizes and thanks essential employees with disabilities or who are blind for their vital contributions.