Summary: S.Res.70 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (02/27/2019)

This resolution authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees for March 1, 2019-September 30, 2019, for FY2020, and for October 1, 2020-February 28, 2021: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Armed Services; (3) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (4) Budget; (5) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (6) Energy and Natural Resources; (7) Environment and Public Works; (8) Finance; (9) Foreign Relations; (10) Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions; (11) Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs; (12) Judiciary; (13) Rules and Administration; (14) Small Business and Entrepreneurship; (15) Veterans' Affairs; (16) Special Committee on Aging; (17) Select Committee on Intelligence; and (18) Indian Affairs. The resolution requires committee expenses, with specified exceptions, to be paid from the contingent fund of the Senate upon vouchers approved by the chair of the applicable committee.

The resolution authorizes establishment of a special reserve within funds in the Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations account, to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.